This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 01:40:47 (UTC).

SEAN REED VS AFNAN RAHMAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2020 SEAN REED filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AFNAN RAHMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RUTH ANN KWAN and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5839

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RUTH ANN KWAN

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REED SEAN

Defendants

ADEKAYODE KEVIN

RAHMAN AFNAN

MASEN LLC

LEWIS BRANDON A.

OPENNODE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BISHARAT NABIL

Defendant Attorneys

FENSTER FRED A.

FENSTER FRED A

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/1/2021: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

4/1/2021: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER

4/28/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] PROTECTIVE ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER;)

4/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER;)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [JOINT] TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

4/29/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER [JOINT] TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

4/29/2021: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NABIL BISHARAT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SEAN REED'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, AN

4/29/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NABIL BISHARAT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SEAN REED'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, AN

Order - ORDER RULING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL 5/4/21

5/4/2021: Order - ORDER RULING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL 5/4/21

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

5/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

5/5/2021: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF NABIL BISHARAT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SEAN REEDS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, REQ

6/15/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF NABIL BISHARAT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SEAN REEDS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, REQ

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SEAN REED'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AGA

6/15/2021: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SEAN REED'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AGA

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

6/15/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Notice of Ruling

6/22/2021: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO DEEM REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ADMITTED)

Notice - NOTICE OF SCHEDULING ORDER

11/23/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF SCHEDULING ORDER

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/17/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2022
  • Hearing05/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • Hearing05/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Sean Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (OF NABIL BISHARAT IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SEAN REED?S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AGAIN); Filed by Sean Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketReply (IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF SEAN REED'S MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED AND COMPEL RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION, AND SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES AGAINST DEFENDANT BRANDON A. LEWIS); Filed by Sean Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Sean Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Sean Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Sean Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Sean Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Sean Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sean Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sean Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sean Reed (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer NABIL A. BISHARAT