This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2020 at 00:15:58 (UTC).

SEAN PETER GOULDEN, ET AL. VS BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 SEAN PETER GOULDEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5381

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GOULDEN SEAN PETER

GOULDEN TAMARA

Defendants

BMW OF NORTH AMERICA LLC

NICK ALEXANDER IMPORTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KORPER RENE

Defendant Attorneys

SWENSON JOHN

HOM BRIAN M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/19/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 03/18/2020

Answer

2/28/2020: Answer

Answer

3/4/2020: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/5/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/5/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/7/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/17/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/17/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/17/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sean Peter Goulden (Plaintiff); Tamara Goulden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 03/18/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Nick Alexander Imports, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BMW of North America, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sean Peter Goulden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sean Peter Goulden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sean Peter Goulden (Plaintiff); Tamara Goulden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sean Peter Goulden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sean Peter Goulden (Plaintiff); Tamara Goulden (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NICK ALEXANDER IMPORTS A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOM BRIAN MING