This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2022 at 12:10:06 (UTC).

SEAN OLIVER VS LA COLLISION CENTER, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/15/2021 SEAN OLIVER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LA COLLISION CENTER, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT B. BROADBELT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1935

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT B. BROADBELT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLIVER SEAN DBA THERMO AIR SPRAY BOOTHS

Defendants

BOYADZFIYAN MANUK

FURNCHYAN ANGELA

LA COLI. ISION CENTER LLC

LA COLLISION CENTER INC.

PILAVDZHYAN AVETIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HONEY ROGER G. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

SOGOYAN JACK

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

11/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT CASK MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

11/30/2022: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING AT CASK MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Case Management Statement

11/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Answer - DEFENDANTS LA COLLISION CENTER, INC.S, AVETIS PILAVDZHYANS, MANUK BOYADZHYANS, ANGELA FURNCHYANS, AND LA COLLISION CENTER, LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES DEM

7/22/2022: Answer - DEFENDANTS LA COLLISION CENTER, INC.S, AVETIS PILAVDZHYANS, MANUK BOYADZHYANS, ANGELA FURNCHYANS, AND LA COLLISION CENTER, LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES DEM

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/22/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

7/15/2022: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/15/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/18/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/18/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/18/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/18/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

7/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROGER G. HONEY REGARDING TWO ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE

7/29/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROGER G. HONEY REGARDING TWO ORDERS TO SHOW CAUSE

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE DEFENDANT VIA SECRETARY OF STATE. (CORP. CODE 1702)

7/29/2021: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SERVE DEFENDANT VIA SECRETARY OF STATE. (CORP. CODE 1702)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • Hearing02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 53 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling AT CASK MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed by: Sean Oliver (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 02/22/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint; scheduled for 11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 11/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: Sean Oliver (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS LA COLLISION CENTER, INC.S, AVETIS PILAVDZHYANS, MANUK BOYADZHYANS, ANGELA FURNCHYANS, AND LA COLLISION CENTER, LLCS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY; Filed by: LA Collision Center, Inc. (Defendant); AVETIS PILAVDZHYAN (Defendant); MANUK BOYADZFIYAN (Defendant); ANGELA FURNCHYAN (Defendant); LA COLI.,ISION CENTER, LLC, (Defendant); As to: Sean Oliver (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: LA Collision Center, Inc. (Defendant); AVETIS PILAVDZHYAN (Defendant); MANUK BOYADZFIYAN (Defendant); ANGELA FURNCHYAN (Defendant); LA COLI.,ISION CENTER, LLC, (Defendant); As to: Sean Oliver (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment / Default Rejected: Name Extension: / Default Rejected; As To Parties changed from AVETIS PILAVDZHYAN (Defendant) to AVETIS PILAVDZHYAN (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketAddress for Roger G. Honey, Esq. (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 53

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Roger Glen Honey (Attorney): Middle Name: Glen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketAddress for Roger Glen Honey (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sean Oliver (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert B. Broadbelt in Department 53 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sean Oliver (Plaintiff); As to: LA Collision Center, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sean Oliver (Plaintiff); As to: LA Collision Center, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sean Oliver (Plaintiff); As to: LA Collision Center, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOGOYAN JACK