This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/07/2019 at 21:27:01 (UTC).

SEAN MICHAEL CAMERON VS THE MADISON SQUARE GARDEN COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 SEAN MICHAEL CAMERON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE MADISON SQUARE GARDEN COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0081

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAMERON SEAN MICHAEL

Defendants

MSG SPORTS & ENTERTAINMENT LLC

NCR CORPORATION

MSG FORUM LLC

THE MADISON SQUARE GARDEN COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORENO GERARDO

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

11/27/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

11/27/2019: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/6/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/6/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/6/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • Hearing11/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 4A at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Hearing05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 4A at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • Hearing04/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 4A at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SEAN MICHAEL CAMERON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SEAN MICHAEL CAMERON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SEAN MICHAEL CAMERON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSG Sports & Entertainment, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MADISON SQUARE GARDEN COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where MSG FORUM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NCR Corporation is a litigant