This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 14:19:01 (UTC).

SEAN ADLEY VS MELVIN LUCIEN

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 SEAN ADLEY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MELVIN LUCIEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0578

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADLEY SEAN

Defendant

LUCIEN MELVIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKER JOHN M

Defendant Attorney

OGUNNUBI MELISSA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/2/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/16/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/16/2021: PI General Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

8/4/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

Answer

8/4/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2024
  • Hearing05/29/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • Hearing11/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • Hearing11/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Melvin Lucien (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL AND NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES); Filed by Melvin Lucien (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sean Adley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sean Adley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sean Adley (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer OGUNNUBI MELISSA