This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2021 at 11:22:14 (UTC).

SEACLIFF CENTRE POINTE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS SERVICE CONNECTION, CORPORATION, A NEVADA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/10/2019 SEACLIFF CENTRE POINTE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SERVICE CONNECTION, CORPORATION, A NEVADA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0208

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEACLIFF CENTRE POINTE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

SERVICE CONNECTION CORPORATION A NEVADA CORPORATION

BALIBRERA VERONICA

FORTUNATI CHRISTIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CADDEN THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

10/29/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION, APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION]

8/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION, APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION]

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

4/22/2020: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

4/22/2020: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

4/22/2020: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KATIE MCKENNA ISO REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

3/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF KATIE MCKENNA ISO REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SJH ISO CALCULATION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

3/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SJH ISO CALCULATION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/15/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

12/16/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

11/22/2019: Notice of Rejection Of Electronic Filing

Case Management Statement

11/22/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Mail

12/4/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

12/4/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Declaration - DECLARATION ISO APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO PUBLISH

9/26/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION ISO APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO PUBLISH

Proof of Personal Service

8/6/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/10/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/10/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Orange County); Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Application and Order for Appearance and Examination, Application and Order for Appearance and Examination]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department A, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketDeclaration (ISO Application for Order to Publish); Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEACLIFF CENTRE POINTE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CADDEN THOMAS