This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2021 at 00:06:30 (UTC).

SEACLIFF CENTRE POINTE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS CLOUD B, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/05/2020 SEACLIFF CENTRE POINTE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CLOUD B, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS D. LONG and KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0247

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

THOMAS D. LONG

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SEACLIFF CENTRE POINTE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendant

CLOUD B INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CADDEN THOMAS

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

9/16/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

7/6/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY)

6/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY) OF 06/21/2021

6/21/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: BANKRUPTCY) OF 06/21/2021

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/29/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/10/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

2/19/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

3/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

12/22/2020: Notice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/25/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

10/19/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/5/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

10/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET ADDENDUM

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/6/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReBankruptcy) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy) of 06/21/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Bankruptcy)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A, Thomas D. Long, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNotice of Stay of Proceedings (Bankruptcy); Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum); Filed by Seacliff Centre Pointe, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLOUD B INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SEACLIFF CENTRE POINTE LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant