This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/22/2020 at 08:27:21 (UTC).

SCS FLOORING SYSTEMS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SHAWMUT WOODWORKING & SUPPLY, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 SCS FLOORING SYSTEMS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHAWMUT WOODWORKING SUPPLY, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4727

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCS FLOORING SYSTEMS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

MACERICH SMP LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

SHAWMUT WOODWORKING & SUPPLY INC. DBA SHAWMUT DESIGN AND CONSTRUCTION A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION

SHAREWELL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANE SCOTT ROBINSON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

2/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service

12/18/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/18/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

12/18/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/11/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/11/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/11/2019: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SCS Flooring Systems, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SCS Flooring Systems, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SCS Flooring Systems, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SCS Flooring Systems, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SCS Flooring Systems, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SCS Flooring Systems, a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SCS FLOORING SYSTEMS is a litigant

Latest cases where MACERICH SMP LP A DELAWARE LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases where SHAWMUT WOODWORKING & SUPPLY INC. A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANE SCOTT R.