This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2022 at 15:20:52 (UTC).

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY VS UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE B1136P03460-19

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE B1136P03460-19. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0546

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE B1136P03460-19

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ASTENGO DAVID A.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/20/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

9/19/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/19/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

9/19/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

9/19/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Complaint

9/19/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/29/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/29/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

11/8/2022: Notice - OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE L. TOMMEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE B1136P03460-19S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

11/8/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE L. TOMMEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE B1136P03460-19S DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE L. TOMMEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE B1136P03460-19S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

11/8/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MICHELLE L. TOMMEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE B1136P03460-19S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

11/8/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Judicial Notice

11/8/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Proof of Service by Mail

11/8/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Response - RESPONSE SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANYS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

11/21/2022: Response - RESPONSE SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANYS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • Hearing01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • Hearing12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketResponse SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANYS RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed by: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of demurrer to plaintiff's complaint: Name Extension changed from Defendant Underwriters At Lloyds Subscribing to Certificate B1136P03460-19s Notice of Demurrer And Demurrer to Plaintiffs Complaint to of demurrer to plaintiff's complaint; Exact Name: blank; As To Parties changed from SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff) to SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike scheduled for 12/19/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 74

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • Docketof Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint; Filed by: UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS subscribing to certificate B1136P03460-19 (Defendant); As to: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Michelle L. Tommey in Support Of Defendant Underwriters At Lloyds Subscribing To Certificate B1136P03460-19s Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS subscribing to certificate B1136P03460-19 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities; Filed by: UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS subscribing to certificate B1136P03460-19 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS subscribing to certificate B1136P03460-19 (Defendant); As to: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); After Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint ?: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketAddress for David A. Astengo (Attorney) null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS subscribing to certificate B1136P03460-19 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michelle Williams Court in Department 74 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SCOTTSDALE INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS subscribing to certificate B1136P03460-19 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S SUBSCRIBING TO CERTIFICATE B1136P03460-19 is a litigant

Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASTENGO DAVID A.