This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/28/2022 at 21:03:08 (UTC).

SCOTT WILSON VS RALPHS GROCERY CO., AN OHIO CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 SCOTT WILSON filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against RALPHS GROCERY CO , AN OHIO CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6884

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSON SCOTT

Defendants

''ROBERT'' RALPHS EMPLOYEE

RALPHS GROCERY CO. AN OHIO CORPORATION

THE KROGER CO. AN OHIO CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELLIS ANDREW

Defendant Attorney

STONE GREGORY

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/24/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

2/24/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: PERSONAL INJURY PROCEDURES

Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/24/2022: Unknown - SECOND AMENDED SUPPLEMENTAL STANDING ORDER RE: COVID PROTECTIVE MEASURES RELATED TO FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

2/24/2022: Unknown - THIRD AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/24/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Complaint

2/24/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

2/24/2022: Unknown - SIXTH AMENDED STANDING ORDER RE: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/11/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

3/11/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Proof of Personal Service

3/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/21/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

4/11/2022: Answer

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2025
  • Hearing02/20/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2023
  • Hearing08/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • Hearing08/10/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 28 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Hughes Markets, Inc. dba Ralphs Erroneously sued as The Kroger Co. an Ohio Corporation and Erroneously Sued As RALPHS GROCERY Co., an Ohio Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SCOTT WILSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SCOTT WILSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Remote Appearance); Filed by SCOTT WILSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by SCOTT WILSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketThird Amended Standing Order re: Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketSixth Amended Standing Order re: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketSecond Amended Supplemental Standing Order re: COVID Protective Measures Related to Final Status Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order re: Personal Injury Procedures; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SCOTT WILSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SCOTT WILSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SCOTT WILSON (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE KROGER CO. AN OHIO CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIS ANDREW