This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/20/2021 at 20:13:13 (UTC).

SCOTT WILDERMAN VS LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2020 SCOTT WILDERMAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5139

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILDERMAN SCOTT

Defendants

LOS ANGELES DEPARTMENT OF WATER AND POWER

SMITH JOHN

COLVIN MARSHALL

CONTRERAS JESSIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD BRADFORD T.

Defendant Attorneys

GOLDSMITH MICHELE

GOLDSMITH MICHELE M.

Other Attorneys

CHILD BRADFORD

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

9/27/2021: Case Management Statement

Application for Publication

9/27/2021: Application for Publication

Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR JESSIE

10/4/2021: Order for Publication - ORDER FOR PUBLICATION FOR JESSIE

Case Management Statement

10/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO THE ...)

8/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILING OF PROOF OF SERVICE AS TO THE ...)

Declaration re: Due Diligence

8/24/2021: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Answer

7/28/2021: Answer

Notice of Change of Firm Name

7/28/2021: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Case Management Statement

8/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

8/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

3/22/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

3/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF RULING

Proof of Service - No Service

3/8/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service

3/8/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service

3/8/2021: Proof of Service - No Service

Request for Dismissal

3/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • Hearing10/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Filing of Proof of service as to the remaining un-served defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • Hearing10/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 76 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant); John Smith (Defendant); Marshall Colvin (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketOrder for Publication (for Jessie); Filed by Scott Wilderman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketApplication for Publication; Filed by Scott Wilderman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Scott Wilderman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by Scott Wilderman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Filing of Proof of service as to the remaining un-served defendants) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Filing of Proof of service as to the ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (In Support of Demurrer and Motion to Strike); Filed by Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Scott Wilderman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (Dec of Dem Civ 141); Filed by Los Angeles Department of Water and Power (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Scott Wilderman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Scott Wilderman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Scott Wilderman (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHILD BRADFORD T. ESQ.