This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/18/2022 at 03:57:36 (UTC).

SCOTT THOMAS RUSSELL VS FRED ANTHONY MICHAEL BAUER

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 SCOTT THOMAS RUSSELL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FRED ANTHONY MICHAEL BAUER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9767

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUSSELL SCOTT THOMAS

Defendant

BAUER FRED ANTHONY MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOSTER RICHARD M.

Defendant Attorney

READER CHAN B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/6/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/6/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/6/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/6/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

8/17/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

8/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

Proof of Service - No Service

10/15/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service - No Service

10/15/2020: Proof of Service - No Service

Demand for Jury Trial

11/9/2020: Demand for Jury Trial

Answer

11/9/2020: Answer

Notice of Ruling

1/6/2022: Notice of Ruling

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

12/28/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/18/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Change of Firm Name

5/16/2022: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

8/16/2022: Notice of Change of Handling Attorney

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

10/10/2022: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2022
  • Hearing12/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • Hearing11/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketStipulation - No Order Stipulation to Continue Trial; Filed by: Scott Thomas Russell (Plaintiff); As to: Scott Thomas Russell (Plaintiff); Fred Anthony Michael Bauer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Handling Attorney; Filed by: Fred Anthony Michael Bauer (Defendant); As to: Scott Thomas Russell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Chan B. Reader (Attorney): Organization Name changed from Hartsuyker, Stratman & Williams-Abrego to STRATMAN & WILLIAMS - ABREGO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketAddress for Chan B. Reader (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: Fred Anthony Michael Bauer (Defendant); New Firm Name: STRATMAN & WILLIAMS - ABREGO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: Scott Thomas Russell (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 02/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Type changed from Non-Jury Trial to Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/20/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Scott Thomas Russell (Plaintiff); As to: Fred Anthony Michael Bauer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Scott Thomas Russell (Plaintiff); As to: Fred Anthony Michael Bauer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Scott Thomas Russell (Plaintiff); As to: Fred Anthony Michael Bauer (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kristin S. Escalante in Department 29 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer READER CHAN B.