This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2021 at 16:27:34 (UTC).

SCOTT SOKOL VS GABRIEL AARON MADRID, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 SCOTT SOKOL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GABRIEL AARON MADRID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1593

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SOKOL SCOTT

Defendants

MADRID ED

MADRID GABRIEL AARON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISENBERG GARY CARL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/26/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/26/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/26/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/26/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2024
  • Hearing08/22/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • Hearing02/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • Hearing02/09/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Scott Sokol (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Scott Sokol (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Scott Sokol (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISENBERG GARY CARL