This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/27/2022 at 16:34:20 (UTC).

SCOTT NORLUND, ET AL. VS KEN SAMPSON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/17/2022 SCOTT NORLUND, filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against KEN SAMPSON,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6066

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KAVANAGH KATHRYN

NORLUND SCOTT

Defendants

SAMPSON DEY

SAMPSON KEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FOSTER RICHARD M.

Defendant Attorney

CREAMER STEVEN E.

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/17/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/17/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:)

5/27/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:) OF 05/27/2022

5/27/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:) OF 05/27/2022

Answer

5/13/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

6/21/2022: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 47 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Scott Norlund (Plaintiff); Kathryn Kavanagh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 47; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Docketat 10:38 AM in Department 47, Theresa M. Traber, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:) of 05/27/2022); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ken Sampson (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Scott Norlund (Plaintiff); Kathryn Kavanagh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Scott Norlund (Plaintiff); Kathryn Kavanagh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Scott Norlund (Plaintiff); Kathryn Kavanagh (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CREAMER, STEVEN E