Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2019 at 03:52:01 (UTC).

SCOTT LESSER VS CANALI BOUTIQUE ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 SCOTT LESSER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CANALI BOUTIQUE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CHRISTOPHER K. LUI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1433

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CHRISTOPHER K. LUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

LESSER SCOTT

Defendants and Respondents

CANALI USA INC

DOES 1 TO 100

CANALI BOUTIQUE

BOUTIQUE CANALI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BINA SEAN ESQ.

BINA SEAN

Defendant Attorney

SAWYER JAMES FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

4/5/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

4/5/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order

4/12/2019: Minute Order

Unknown

5/1/2019: Unknown

Answer

5/1/2019: Answer

SUMMONS

10/27/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/27/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2019
  • Answer; Filed by Canali Trading, LLC Erroneously Sued As CANALI BOUTIQUE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Canali Trading, LLC Erroneously Sued As CANALI BOUTIQUE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 4A, Christopher K. Lui, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by SCOTT LESSER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Proof of Personal Service; Filed by SCOTT LESSER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by SCOTT LESSER (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANALI U.S.A. INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SAWYER JAMES FRANCIS