This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 06:53:11 (UTC).

SCOTT KASTEINER VS ALL AMERICAN DESIGN, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2017 SCOTT KASTEINER filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against ALL AMERICAN DESIGN, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DAN THOMAS OKI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0946

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DAN THOMAS OKI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KASTEINER SCOTT

Defendant

ALL AMERICAN DESIGN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GASTELUM OMAR LAW OFFICES OF

 

Court Documents

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

9/14/2018: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J, Dan Thomas Oki, Presiding; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Scott Kasteiner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Petition Granted) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-02-01 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketOrder; Filed by Scott Kasteiner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Scott Kasteiner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-12-15 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Matter continued) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-11-28 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department J; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; OSC Discharged) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Scott Kasteiner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Scott Kasteiner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Scott Kasteiner (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less