This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2023 at 03:13:03 (UTC).

SCOTT J SONDHEIMER, ET AL. VS JOAQUIN ANTONIO RODRIGUEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 SCOTT J SONDHEIMER, filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JOAQUIN ANTONIO RODRIGUEZ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL E. WHITAKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6523

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL E. WHITAKER

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

SONDHEIMER CARL M

SONDHEIMER FAMILY TRUST

SONDHEIMER SCOTT J

Defendants

RODRIGUEZ CHRISTIAN

RODRIGUEZ JOAQUIN ANTONIO

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

RODRIGUEZ JOAQUIN ANTONIO

RODRGIUEZ MAYRA N.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

REQUEJO TOMAS D

Cross Defendant Attorney

PHILLIPS CAROLYN C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/23/2022: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Motion to Continue Trial Date - MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE OF JOAQUIN AND MYRA RODRIGUEZ;

5/22/2023: Motion to Continue Trial Date - MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE OF JOAQUIN AND MYRA RODRIGUEZ;

Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

4/12/2023: Proof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

4/6/2023: Order Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL;)

4/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL;)

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING AFTER HEARING

4/4/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RULING AFTER HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON ...)

3/21/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON ...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/21/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Continuance

3/21/2023: Notice of Continuance

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

3/21/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON THE HEARING TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR CHRISTIAN RODRIGUEZ; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER GRANTING THE MOTION TO BE REL

3/15/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME ON THE HEARING TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR CHRISTIAN RODRIGUEZ; OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE FOR AN ORDER GRANTING THE MOTION TO BE REL

Substitution of Attorney

3/14/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

3/14/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

3/6/2023: Declaration in Support of Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

3/6/2023: Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

Answer

3/21/2022: Answer

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/22/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

PI General Order

1/5/2022: PI General Order

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2024
  • Hearing12/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2023
  • Hearing08/17/2023 at 1:30 PM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • Hearing06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • Hearing06/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketMotion to Continue Trial Date; Filed by: Joaquin Antonio Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Continue Trial Date OF JOAQUIN AND MYRA RODRIGUEZ;: Name Extension: OF JOAQUIN AND MYRA RODRIGUEZ; ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Continue Trial scheduled for 08/17/2023 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2023
  • DocketProof of Service - Order Granting Attorney's Motion to be Relieved as Counsel; Filed by: Christian Rodriguez (Defendant); As to: Carl M Sondheimer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketOrder Granting Attorney's Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel-Civil; Signed and Filed by: Christian Rodriguez (Defendant); As to: Joaquin Antonio Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel: Filed By: Christian Rodriguez (Defendant),Joaquin Antonio Rodriguez (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 04/04/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Carl M Sondheimer (Plaintiff), Sondheimer Family Trust (Plaintiff), Scott J Sondheimer (Plaintiff) to Scott J Sondheimer (Plaintiff), Sondheimer Family Trust (Plaintiff), Carl M Sondheimer (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 06/06/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/17/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Scott J Sondheimer (Plaintiff); Carl M Sondheimer (Plaintiff); Sondheimer Family Trust (Plaintiff); As to: Joaquin Antonio Rodriguez (Defendant); Christian Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Scott J Sondheimer (Plaintiff); Carl M Sondheimer (Plaintiff); Sondheimer Family Trust (Plaintiff); As to: Joaquin Antonio Rodriguez (Defendant); Christian Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Scott J Sondheimer (Plaintiff); Carl M Sondheimer (Plaintiff); Sondheimer Family Trust (Plaintiff); As to: Joaquin Antonio Rodriguez (Defendant); Christian Rodriguez (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael E. Whitaker in Department 32 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******6523 Hearing Date: April 4, 2023 Dept: 32

PLEASE NOTE: Parties are encouraged to meet and confer concerning this tentative ruling to determine if a resolution may be reached. If the parties are unable to reach a resolution and a party intends to submit on this tentative ruling, the party must send an email to the Court at sscdept32@lacourt.org indicating that party’s intention to submit. The email shall include the case number, date and time of the hearing, counsel’s contact information (if applicable), and the identity of the party submitting on this tentative ruling. If the Court does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on this tentative ruling and there are no appearances at the hearing, the Court may place the motion off calendar or adopt the tentative ruling as the order of the Court. If all parties do not submit on this tentative ruling, they should arrange to appear in-person or remotely (which is highly encouraged). Further, after the Court has posted/issued a tentative ruling, the Court has the inherent authority to prohibit the withdrawal of the subject motion and adopt the tentative ruling as the order of the Court.

TENTATIVE RULING

DEPARTMENT

32

HEARING DATE

April 4, 2023

CASE NUMBER

*******6523

MOTION

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel

MOVING PARTY

Attorney Steven Trolard

OPPOSING PARTY

None

MOTION

Steven Trolard of Steven Trolard & Associates, PLC (Counsel) moves to be relieved as counsel for Defendants Joaquin Antonio Rodriguez and Christian Rodriguez, as well as Cross-Complainant Mayra N. Rodriguez (collectively, Clients).

Preliminarily, the Court notes that Counsel filed a single motion to be relieved as counsel from all three Clients. Instead, Counsel should have filed one motion as to each Client for a total of three motions. The Court will therefore order Counsel to pay an additional $120 in filing fees, at $60.00 per filing fee. (Gov. Code, 70617, subd. (a).)

ANALYSIS

Counsel has filed forms MC-051 and MC-052 and has lodged with the Court the proposed order on form MC-053 as required. (Cal Rules of Court, rule 3.1362.) The basis for the motion is Counsel’s wife has undergone cancer removal surgery. Counsel is his wife’s primary caregiver as she is home recovering which has caused Counsel extreme stress, health issues, and has made representation Clients in this case impossible. This is a valid reason for withdrawal. (See Rules Prof. Conduct, rule 1.16.) Accordingly, the Court grants the motion.

Counsel shall file MC-053 for each Client, which shall include information about all future hearings and proceedings noticed by any party, or ordered by the Court, on or before April 10. 2023.

After the Court approves the MC-053s, Counsel shall serve the MC-053 on each Client and all other parties who have appeared in the action, within 10 days of the date of the signed orders, and file proofs of service of such. Counsel will remain the attorney of record for Clients until Counsel files the requisite proofs of service. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.1362(e).)