This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/10/2020 at 23:18:11 (UTC).

SCOTT J. LEIPZIG VS KRISTA M. MYHRE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2019 SCOTT J LEIPZIG filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against KRISTA M MYHRE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2875

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEIPZIG SCOTT J.

Defendants

MCGAUGHEY & SPIRITO A BUSINESS ENTITY OF UNKNOWN FORM

MYHRE KRISTA M.

MCGAUGHEY & SPIRITO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEIPZIG SCOTT J.

Defendant Attorneys

BODENSTEIN JANETTE SHARON

GOWER RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/6/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

5/7/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

4/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/14/2020

Notice of Settlement

2/28/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

3/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Substitution of Attorney

1/16/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/1/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

11/1/2019: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

11/4/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF ERRATA

Case Management Statement

11/4/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/6/2019: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT - 1ST

9/27/2019: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT - 1ST

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/22/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/11/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/28/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/28/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by McGaughey & Spirito (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Scott J. Leipzig (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 78; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docketat 09:03 AM in Department 78; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/14/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketNotice (Of Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal); Filed by Scott J. Leipzig (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • Docketat 2:54 PM in Department 78; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 03/04/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by Scott J. Leipzig (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Scott J. Leipzig (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketNotice ( of Case Management Conference); Filed by Scott J. Leipzig (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Scott J. Leipzig (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Scott J. Leipzig (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Scott J. Leipzig (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Scott J. Leipzig (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Scott J. Leipzig (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BODENSTEIN JANETTE SHARON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOWER RICHARD