This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2021 at 22:00:37 (UTC).

SCOTT GIZER VS PRIORITY TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 SCOTT GIZER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PRIORITY TITLE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA A. MEIERS and GREGORY W. ALARCON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6834

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA A. MEIERS

GREGORY W. ALARCON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GIZER SCOTT

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

PRIORITY TITLE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FORWARD CALABASAS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA PARKWAY ESCROW DBA KELLER WILLIAMS OF CALABASAS DBA KELLER WILLIAMS REALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GIZER SCOTT

GIZER SCOTT EVAN

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LEFF ANDREW L

ANAYA ALANA B

GOOR RICHARD LYLE

MALEK JONATHAN A.

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

7/20/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

5/7/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

5/11/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

5/11/2021: Cross-Complaint

Case Management Statement

6/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/1/2021: Case Management Statement

Answer

6/1/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

6/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/6/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

4/6/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/6/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/30/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/12/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

3/12/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/19/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

3/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • Hearing06/29/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Hearing06/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order (AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY); Filed by Priority Title Company, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 36, Gregory W. Alarcon, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 12, Barbara A. Meiers, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Forward Calabasas, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Priority Title Company, a California corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Scott Gizer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Scott Gizer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Scott Gizer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Priority Title Company, a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Forward Calabasas, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Forward Calabasas, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Scott Gizer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Scott Gizer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Scott Gizer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Scott Gizer (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FORWARD CALABASAS INC. CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIORITY TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIZER SCOTT E.