Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2021 at 11:46:10 (UTC).

SCOTT EHRLICH VS MARIA VALENZUELA

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 SCOTT EHRLICH filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against MARIA VALENZUELA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD L. FRUIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4323

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RICHARD L. FRUIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EHRLICH SCOTT

Defendant

VALENZUELA MARIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE

PELAEZ G. JACQUELINE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

4/21/2021: Notice of Ruling

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

4/6/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL (UNLAWFUL DETAINER);) OF 04/06/2021

4/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER; NOTICE OF NON-JURY TRIAL (UNLAWFUL DETAINER);) OF 04/06/2021

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/26/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

2/26/2021: Unknown - SUPPLEMENTAL COVER SHEET AND ALLEGATIONS FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER - COMPLAINT

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/1/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/2/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/2/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/18/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

2/18/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/24/2021: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Answer

2/24/2021: Answer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/3/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/3/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/3/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/3/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2/4/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (MARIA VALENZUELA)

2/4/2021: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (MARIA VALENZUELA)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • Hearing06/07/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 15 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Scott Ehrlich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial (Unlawful Detainer) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Jury Trial Unlawful Detainer)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • Docketat 2:29 PM in Department 15, Richard L. Fruin, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order; Notice of Non-Jury Trial (Unlawful Detainer);) of 04/06/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order; Notice of Non-Jury Trial (Unlawful Detainer);)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Scott Ehrlich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRequest/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by Scott Ehrlich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Scott Ehrlich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (- NOT ENTERED); Filed by Scott Ehrlich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Maria Valenzuela)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketPlaintiff?s Mandatory Cover Sheet and Supplemental Allegations ? Unlawful Detainer; Filed by Scott Ehrlich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Scott Ehrlich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet (Addendum); Filed by Scott Ehrlich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint (For Unlawful Detainer); Filed by Scott Ehrlich (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELAEZ JACQUELINE JACQUELINE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PELAEZ GRACE JACQUELINE