This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 08:41:11 (UTC).

SCOTT DELLINGER VS ATKINS NORTH AMERICA, INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/29/2021 SCOTT DELLINGER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ATKINS NORTH AMERICA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3605

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DELLINGER SCOTT

Defendants

ATKINS NORTH AMERICA INC

NEWTON MIKE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BENT SERGIO

Defendant Attorney

LEE HYUN B.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/29/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/29/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/29/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/29/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/29/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

4/29/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/29/2021

4/29/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/29/2021

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

4/22/2021: Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Answer

4/19/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF DEFENDANT'S REMOVAL O...) OF 08/03/2021

8/3/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF DEFENDANT'S REMOVAL O...) OF 08/03/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF DEFENDANT'S REMOVAL O...)

8/3/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE STATUS OF DEFENDANT'S REMOVAL O...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (re Status of Defendant's Removal of Action to Federal Court) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re Status of Defendant's Removal o...) of 08/03/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re Status of Defendant's Removal o...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docketat 2:38 PM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/29/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court; Filed by Atkins North America, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Atkins North America, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Scott Dellinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Scott Dellinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Scott Dellinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Scott Dellinger (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Atkins North America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENT SERGIO