This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 00:27:52 (UTC).

SCOTT BILLUPS, ET AL. VS STAYWELL LABORATORIES, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 SCOTT BILLUPS filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STAYWELL LABORATORIES, INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3824

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BILLUPS SCOTT

BILLUPS HISAKO

Defendants

TERRA TECH A NEVADA CORPORATION

STAYWELL LABORATORIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

ONEQOR A DELAWARE CORPORATION

MORGAN MATTHEW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH GREGORY M.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

4/1/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice - NOTICE JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING DISMISSAL AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF DISMISSAL

1/14/2021: Notice - NOTICE JOINT STATEMENT REGARDING DISMISSAL AND REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF DISMISSAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

1/21/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice of Settlement

10/14/2020: Notice of Settlement

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

10/15/2020: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOURTH JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/11/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER FOURTH JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT AND CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/14/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER THIRD JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

8/21/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER THIRD JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

8/31/2020: Case Management Statement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

7/27/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER SECOND JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

7/13/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/28/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Personal Service

5/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/28/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/8/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/8/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SCOTT BILLUPS (Plaintiff); HISAKO BILLUPS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice (Joint Statement Regarding Dismissal and Request for Continuance of Dismissal); Filed by SCOTT BILLUPS (Plaintiff); HISAKO BILLUPS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by SCOTT BILLUPS (Plaintiff); HISAKO BILLUPS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docketat 08:45 AM in Department 32, Daniel S. Murphy, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by STAYWELL LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); ONEQOR, a Delaware Corporation (Defendant); MATTHEW MORGAN (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint); Filed by STAYWELL LABORATORIES, INC., a Delaware Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SCOTT BILLUPS (Plaintiff); HISAKO BILLUPS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SCOTT BILLUPS (Plaintiff); HISAKO BILLUPS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by SCOTT BILLUPS (Plaintiff); HISAKO BILLUPS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by SCOTT BILLUPS (Plaintiff); HISAKO BILLUPS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SCOTT BILLUPS (Plaintiff); HISAKO BILLUPS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SCOTT BILLUPS (Plaintiff); HISAKO BILLUPS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SCOTT BILLUPS (Plaintiff); HISAKO BILLUPS (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TERRA TECH CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH GREGORY M. ESQ.