This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2021 at 09:45:30 (UTC).

SCHUETZE, LAURA VS LUKE, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 SCHUETZE, LAURA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LUKE, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0973

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCHUETZE LAURA

Respondent

LUKE MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

MILES JOY KRAFT

MILES JOY WREN

Respondent Attorney

INGLIS CHRISTINE REYNOLDS

 

Court Documents

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

6/18/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Notice - Case Assignment

6/18/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

6/17/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Summons

6/17/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

6/17/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Proof of Service of Summons

6/25/2021: Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration - Income and Expense

8/26/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

8/26/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

8/17/2021: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

8/17/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Substitution of Attorney - Atty. Christine Reynolds Inglis Sub In

8/12/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Atty. Christine Reynolds Inglis Sub In

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney (Atty. Christine Reynolds Inglis Sub In ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNotice - Acknowledgment of Receipt of Summons & Petition; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILES JOY WREN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILES JOY KRAFT