This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/09/2022 at 15:14:18 (UTC).

SCHUBERT, ERNST MARTIN - DECEDENT

Case Summary

On 04/20/2020 SCHUBERT, ERNST MARTIN - DECEDENT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOGDANOFF, LEE R.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3238

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOGDANOFF, LEE R.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PUBLIC ADMINISTRATOR

Claimants

DUNN NHU-TUYET

ASCENSIONPOINT RECOVERY SERVICES LLC

CITY OF TORRANCE

Decedent

SCHUBERT ERNST MARTIN

Not Classified By Court

DARDEN SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MOGIL DEBORAH P

Claimant Attorneys

THOMPSON-BELL DELLA DIANA

GREEN RAYMOND DAVID

 

Court Documents

Order - Approving Report of Administration Regarding Status of Estate

8/5/2022: Order - Approving Report of Administration Regarding Status of Estate

Minute Order

7/29/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

6/8/2022: Minute Order

Status Report of Personal Representative - Report of Administrator re Status of Estate

5/18/2022: Status Report of Personal Representative - Report of Administrator re Status of Estate

Notice - Hearing

5/20/2022: Notice - Hearing

Minute Order

2/22/2022: Minute Order

Minute Order

8/5/2021: Minute Order

Order

8/12/2021: Order

Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name - notice of change of address

5/13/2021: Notice - Change of Address/Firm Name - notice of change of address

Status Report of Personal Representative

3/17/2021: Status Report of Personal Representative

Miscellaneous Document - Supplemental Three Inventory and Estimate of Value, $80.00

1/28/2021: Miscellaneous Document - Supplemental Three Inventory and Estimate of Value, $80.00

Notice - Proposed Action

2/18/2021: Notice - Proposed Action

Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice of Amin. to Creditor's to Rolling Hills Plaza LLC.

12/15/2020: Notice - Administration to Creditors - Notice of Amin. to Creditor's to Rolling Hills Plaza LLC.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Creditor's Claim Rejection to Ascensionpoint Recovery Services, LLC $285.91

12/1/2020: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Creditor's Claim Rejection to Ascensionpoint Recovery Services, LLC $285.91

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Creditor's Claim Rejection to Ascensionpoint Recovery Services, LLC $596.31

12/1/2020: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - Creditor's Claim Rejection to Ascensionpoint Recovery Services, LLC $596.31

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - The City of Torrance

11/9/2020: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim (Pay to Others) - The City of Torrance

Inventory & Appraisal - Supplemental Two 9,865.00

11/3/2020: Inventory & Appraisal - Supplemental Two 9,865.00

Notice - Administration to Creditors - to AscensionPoint Recovery

10/2/2020: Notice - Administration to Creditors - to AscensionPoint Recovery

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2023
  • Hearing05/26/2023 at 8:30 AM in Probate Department 29 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketOrder (Approving Report of Administration Regarding Status of Estate )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; Status Report Hearing - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketPetition Granted (Status Report of Personal Representative filed on May 18, 2022 by Public Administrator. )

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEstate Administration Extended

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docketin Probate Department 29, Bogdanoff, Lee R., Presiding; OSC Re Petition for Final Distribution or Status Report - Held - OSC Hearing Off Calendar

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Creditor

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNotice - Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (Supplemental One I&A ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketNotice - Administration to Creditors (Notice to Creditors to Scott Darden ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice - Proposed Action (notice of proposed action ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCreditor's Claim; Filed by Claimant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketInventory & Appraisal (Original I&A ); Filed by Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCreditor's Claim (Nhu-Tuyet Dunn ); Filed by Claimant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet - Initial (PRO 010)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketEx Parte - Petition ($200.00) (ex parte petition of public administrator for order to proceed summarily- drop off ); Filed by Attorney

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less