Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/13/2019 at 07:31:03 (UTC).

SCHNITKER, MOLLY VS SCHNITKER, JOSHUA

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 SCHNITKER, MOLLY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SCHNITKER, JOSHUA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1500

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse South

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SCHNITKER MOLLY

Respondent

SCHNITKER JOSHUA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2018
  • Declaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • Notice - Entry of Judgment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Sent to PS-P FE ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Declaration - Service of Prelim & Final Dec of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • Proof of Service - Mail; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Request - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Judgment Package Received - FC2336 (Sent to Dept P - REJ ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Declaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Statement - Financial; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • Fee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less