Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/20/2021 at 02:07:19 (UTC).

SCHLOMO SCHMUEL VS CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO., LLC

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 SCHLOMO SCHMUEL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO , LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0293

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCHMUEL SCHLOMO

Defendant

CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO. LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUINTANA ANDRES FELIPE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

5/6/2021: Request for Dismissal

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

3/4/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

3/4/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Schlomo Schmuel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Schlomo Schmuel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Schlomo Schmuel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Schlomo Schmuel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Schlomo Schmuel (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASPAR MANAGEMENT CO. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUINTANA ANDRES FELIPE