This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/06/2020 at 17:14:16 (UTC).

SCHLOMO SCHMUEL, AN INDIVIDUAL VS. DIVERSIFIED EQUITY GROUP

Case Summary

On 02/24/2017 SCHLOMO SCHMUEL, AN INDIVIDUAL filed an Other lawsuit against DIVERSIFIED EQUITY GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RALPH C. HOFER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6414

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Glendale Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RALPH C. HOFER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SCHMUEL SCHLOMO AN INDIVIDUAL

SCHMUEL SCHLOMO

Defendants

DIVERSIFIED EQUITY GROUP LLC

FOSTER SQUARE LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUINTANA ANDRES F.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/24/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/24/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

3/27/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

3/27/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Request For Copies

4/4/2017: Request For Copies

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/30/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/9/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT ENTERED

6/20/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DEFAULT ENTERED

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

7/17/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-07-26 00:00:00

7/26/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-07-26 00:00:00

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-09-13 00:00:00

9/13/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-09-13 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

9/15/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQ FOR ENTRY OF COURT'S JUDGMENT

10/20/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQ FOR ENTRY OF COURT'S JUDGMENT

Brief

10/20/2017: Brief

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL-PARTIAL

10/30/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL-PARTIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-11-07 00:00:00

11/7/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-11-07 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST

6/27/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: REQUEST

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

2/5/2020: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by SCHLOMO, SCHMUEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketRequest; Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketRequest (FOR COPY OF ENTIRE FILE -94 PAGES ); Filed by Interested Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (or Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; (Order to Show Cause; Discharged) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department NCGD, Ralph C. Hofer, Presiding; Order to Show Cause (RE ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENTPURSUANT TO SECTION 585 CCP;) - Discharged

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketJDUGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketDefault Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by SCHLOMO, SCHMUEL (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketNotice (of osc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIVERSIFIED EQUITY GROUP LLC AS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer QUINTANA ANDRES FELIPE