This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/15/2022 at 23:26:46 (UTC).

SCALA CONSRUCTION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ANDERSON MOULDING DOORS & WINDOWS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 SCALA CONSRUCTION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against ANDERSON MOULDING DOORS WINDOWS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1946

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. JAY FORD III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SCALA CONSRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

ANDERSON MOULDING DOORS & WINDOWS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AVM WOODWORKING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

B&M CUSTOM GLASS AND MIRROR INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHAD DARLING PLASTERING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

COMFORT CONTROL CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ELEMENTAL DESIGN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GRIFFIN ELECTRIC A SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP

HEPPNER HARDWOODS INC. A DISSOLVED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HYDRO SYSTEMS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JFG PLASTERING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JOHN OLIVER CARPENTRY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KPA SHEET METAL & RAIN GUTTERS A SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP

QUALITY CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION COMPANY A CALIFORNIA PARTNERSHIP

RC BUSH INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

STYLE CONCEPTS & DESIGN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ULTIMATE INSTALLZ INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

VISTA PLUMBING A SOLE PROPRIETORSHIP

WESTERN WINDOW SYSTEMS AN ARIZONA CORPORATION QUALIFIED TO DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA

AVM WOODWORKING INC.

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENESES ESQ E. VAL

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

BOLIN MARK AARON

EBNER DARREN M.

BRAASCH DEBRA L.

ZIMMER JOSEPH T.

KLAWUNDER NINA

MCCLAIN ROBYN

JEFFERY MONA

NOORY HAMED

RHODES BRIAN W

BELTRAM JONATHAN

CARUCCI ANTHONY JOHN

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/8/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER TO SERVE CHAD DARLING PLASTERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP., VIA SECRETARY OF STATE WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

5/31/2022: Order - [PROPOSED] ORDER TO SERVE CHAD DARLING PLASTERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP., VIA SECRETARY OF STATE WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

5/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

5/24/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Case Management Statement

5/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/24/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

5/9/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Case Management Statement

5/18/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/20/2022: Case Management Statement

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/20/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Cross-Complaint

4/27/2022: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/27/2022: Answer

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE IN SUPPORT OF SCALA CONSTRUCTION, INCS APPLICATION TO SERVE CHAD DARLING PLASTERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP., VIA SECRETARY OF STATE WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT;

4/25/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SERVICE IN SUPPORT OF SCALA CONSTRUCTION, INCS APPLICATION TO SERVE CHAD DARLING PLASTERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP., VIA SECRETARY OF STATE WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT;

Application - SCALA CONSTRUCTION, INC.S APPLICATION TO SERVE CHAD DARLING PLASTERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP., VIA SECRETARY OF STATE WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

4/25/2022: Application - SCALA CONSTRUCTION, INC.S APPLICATION TO SERVE CHAD DARLING PLASTERING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORP., VIA SECRETARY OF STATE WITH SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2022
  • Hearing10/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department O at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department O, H. Jay Ford III, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by SCALA CONSRUCTION, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketOrder to Serve Chad Darling Plastering, Inc., a California Corp., Via Secretary of State with Summons and Complaint; Filed by SCALA CONSRUCTION, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by KPA SHEET METAL & RAIN GUTTERS, a sole proprietorship (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by VISTA PLUMBING, a sole proprietorship (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by WESTERN WINDOW SYSTEMS, an Arizona corporation qualified to do business in California (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JOHN OLIVER CARPENTRY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketNotice (of Remote Appearance); Filed by JOHN OLIVER CARPENTRY, INC., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
49 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SCALA CONSRUCTION, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SCALA CONSRUCTION, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SCALA CONSRUCTION, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SCALA CONSRUCTION, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SCALA CONSRUCTION, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SCALA CONSRUCTION, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SCALA CONSRUCTION, INC., a California Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRIFFIN ELECTRIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AVM WOODWORKING INC. is a litigant