This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2019 at 07:31:14 (UTC).

SC DESIGN, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS CASA BLANCA CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 SC DESIGN, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CASA BLANCA CONSTRUCTION DEVELOPMENT INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RANDOLPH A. ROGERS and WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0141

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RANDOLPH A. ROGERS

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SC DESIGN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA PACIFIC WESTERN MILLWORKS

Defendants

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CASA BLANCA CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

AZINIAN AN INDIVIDUAL ROBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DERRYBERRY R. STEVEN

Defendant Attorney

HESS MATTHEW

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

11/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

11/22/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING CONTINUED

9/25/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING CONTINUED

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

9/19/2019: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

8/23/2019: Notice of Settlement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/1/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/7/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

6/20/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

6/19/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

5/9/2019: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/30/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/18/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/19/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/20/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • Hearing02/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department A15 at 42011 4th Street West, Lancaster, CA 93534; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Hearing); Filed by SC DESIGN, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketNotice (of Hearing Continued); Filed by SC DESIGN, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (With Prejudice Pending Consummation of Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department A15, Wendy Chang, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by SC DESIGN, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by SC DESIGN, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by ROBERT AZINIAN, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SC DESIGN, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by SC DESIGN, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SC DESIGN, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by SC DESIGN, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by SC DESIGN, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by SC DESIGN, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SC DESIGN INC is a litigant

Latest cases where American Contractors Indemnity Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DERRYBERRY R. STEVEN