This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2022 at 22:17:16 (UTC).

SBS TRUST DEED NETWORK VS 23830 HATTERAS LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 SBS TRUST DEED NETWORK filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against 23830 HATTERAS LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THERESA M. TRABER. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0336

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THERESA M. TRABER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SBS TRUST DEED NETWORK

Defendants

IN HIS PRESENCE LLC

23830 HATTERAS LLC

CHC BUILDERS INC.

KAM L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUBANOWITZ SHALOM

Defendant Attorneys

DICKER BRIAN S.

MAHER JOSEPH

ROSSMAN ADAM S

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

8/24/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 08/24/2020

8/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 08/24/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

7/1/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 07/01/2020

7/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL) OF 07/01/2020

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/20/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF REQUEST TO REVIEW STIPULATION & ORDER

2/26/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF REQUEST TO REVIEW STIPULATION & ORDER

Answer

2/26/2020: Answer

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RELEASE OF SURPLUS FUNDS

2/27/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER RELEASE OF SURPLUS FUNDS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

2/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/15/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice of Ruling

10/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS IN INT...)

10/8/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS IN INT...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING DEPOSIT OF INTERPLEADER FUNDS

9/25/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING DEPOSIT OF INTERPLEADER FUNDS

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/5/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/5/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING THE DEPOSIT OF INTERPLEAD FUNDS, REIMBURSEMENT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS THEREFROM, DISCHARGING DEFENDANT AND COMPLAINANT

6/13/2019: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING THE DEPOSIT OF INTERPLEAD FUNDS, REIMBURSEMENT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS THEREFROM, DISCHARGING DEFENDANT AND COMPLAINANT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

6/28/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Appearance Case Review)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of 08/24/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Sanctions pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure for Failure to Appear scheduled for 08/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/24/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Sanctions pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure for Failure to Appear scheduled for 08/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal) of 07/01/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 07/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08/28/2020 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 06/12/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/01/2020 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Kam L.P. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Van Nuys Courthouse East in Department U - Hon. Michael J. Conveyeffective 01/02/2019; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Frank J. Johnson in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SBS Trust Deed Network (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SBS Trust Deed Network (Plaintiff); As to: 23830 Hatteras LLC (Defendant); Kam L.P. (Defendant); CHC Builders, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KAM AKAY Enterprises, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CHC BUILDERS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where 23830 HATTERAS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY; is a litigant