This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 13:53:08 (UTC).

SAVOY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION VS PERENNIAL ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/26/2019 SAVOY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PERENNIAL ENGINEERING CONSTRUCTION, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA JESSNER, KENNETH R. FREEMAN, DAVID J. COWAN and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6077

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA JESSNER

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

DAVID J. COWAN

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SAVOY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY

Cross Defendants and Defendants

PERENNIAL ENGINEERING & CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA DM CONSTRUCTION SERVICES

ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION INC.

SBBC ASSOCIATES INC. DBA STONEMARK CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT

JAMES WEST DBA JAMES WEST ROOFING & WATERPROOFING CONSULTANT MOE 5

SBBC ASSOCIATES INC. DBA STONEMARK CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT MOE 4

MOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

SBBC ASSOCIATES INC. DBA STONEMARK CONSTRUCTION MANAGMENT

MARK BEAMISH WATERPROOFING INC. MOE 3

ROES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

JAMES WEST DBA JAMES WEST ROOFING & WATERPROOFING CONSULTANT

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION INC.

MARK BEAMISH WATERPROOFING INC. MOE 3

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LANDRY KARIN

BAUGH ANDREW MICHAEL

TADLOCK LYN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

BOOTH EILEEN

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LE KAYLA

BOOTH EILEEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/22/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/19/2021: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/3/2021: Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/8/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

7/7/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

7/7/2021: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE WHETHER TO ORDER MSC; NON-APPEARANCE CAS...)

6/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE WHETHER TO ORDER MSC; NON-APPEARANCE CAS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

6/24/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

6/24/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER

Case Management Statement

6/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/7/2021: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:) OF 06/09/2021

6/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:) OF 06/09/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:)

6/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER - REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING:)

Case Management Statement

6/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/17/2021: Case Management Statement

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES

6/23/2021: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES AND DEADLINES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

5/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/5/2021: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2022
  • Hearing03/09/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Hearing02/25/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • Hearing02/18/2022 at 4:00 PM in Department 50 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Colony Insurance Company (Plaintiff in Intervention)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Angelus Waterproofing and Restoration, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Angelus Waterproofing and Restoration, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (CROSS-COMPLAINT); Filed by Mark Beamish Waterproofing, Inc., (MOE 3) (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Mark Beamish Waterproofing, Inc., (MOE 3) (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Mark Beamish Waterproofing, Inc., (MOE 3) (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
73 More Docket Entries
  • 08/22/2019
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court) of 08/22/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Savoy Community Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • Docketat 2:15 PM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;) of 08/05/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Savoy Community Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Savoy Community Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PERENNIAL ENGINEERING AND CONSTRUCTION IN is a litigant

Latest cases where SAVOY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MARK BEAMISH WATERPROOFING INC. is a litigant