Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 05:17:48 (UTC).

SAVE OUR NEIGHBORHOOD ET AL VS SOUTH EL MONTE ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/27/2017 SAVE OUR NEIGHBORHOOD filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against SOUTH EL MONTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1976

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

SEPULVEDA DEBRA

CARRILLO ADOLFO

SAVE OUR NEIGHBORHOOD

NEIGHBORHOOD SAVE OUR

Defendants and Respondents

LAWRENCE EQUIPMENT INC

VASQUEZ JENNIFER CITY MANAGER OF THE

DOES 1 TO 50

SOUTH EL MONTE

CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE

MONTE SOUTH EL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

COPPESS MICHAEL J.

Defendant Attorneys

GOLDBERG ALAN N. ESQ.

GIOVINCO GINETTA L.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

AMENDED SUMMONS

2/28/2018: AMENDED SUMMONS

DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENSE COUNSEL'S DECLARATION ETC.

4/5/2018: DECLARATION OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENSE COUNSEL'S DECLARATION ETC.

NOTICE THAT 4/5/18 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR

4/5/2018: NOTICE THAT 4/5/18 TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE IS OFF CALENDAR

NOTICE OF CHANGE IN DEPARTMENT AND TIME FOR HEARING ON DEFENDANT LAWRENCE EQUIPMENT, INC.'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS

4/16/2018: NOTICE OF CHANGE IN DEPARTMENT AND TIME FOR HEARING ON DEFENDANT LAWRENCE EQUIPMENT, INC.'S DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF PLAINTIFFS

NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE REQUESTED BY DEFENDANT LAWRENCE EQUIPMENT, INC.

4/30/2018: NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE REQUESTED BY DEFENDANT LAWRENCE EQUIPMENT, INC.

Minute Order

6/4/2018: Minute Order

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, DAMAGES AND FOR INJUNCTION: (1) DECLARATORY RELIEF-ILLEGAL PRACTICE AND POLICY; ETC

6/11/2018: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, DAMAGES AND FOR INJUNCTION: (1) DECLARATORY RELIEF-ILLEGAL PRACTICE AND POLICY; ETC

PROOF OF SERVICE

7/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

DECLARATION OF MARVIN E. BONILLA IN SUPPORT OF CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

7/13/2018: DECLARATION OF MARVIN E. BONILLA IN SUPPORT OF CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE'S DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONSOLIDATION OF HEARINGS

8/3/2018: NOTICE OF COURT ORDER REGARDING CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND CONSOLIDATION OF HEARINGS

Minute Order

8/21/2018: Minute Order

ORDER RE: (1) SUSTAINING DEFENDANT LAWRENCE EQUIPMENT, INC.'S DEMURRER TO DECLARATORY RELIEF CAUSES OF ACTION IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; AND ETC

8/30/2018: ORDER RE: (1) SUSTAINING DEFENDANT LAWRENCE EQUIPMENT, INC.'S DEMURRER TO DECLARATORY RELIEF CAUSES OF ACTION IN SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND; AND ETC

Minute Order

8/30/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANT CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE'S ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

8/31/2018: DEFENDANT CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE'S ANSWER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE - OTHER (SPECIFY): REAL ESTATE, NUISANCE, ETC.

9/13/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE - OTHER (SPECIFY): REAL ESTATE, NUISANCE, ETC.

NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

1/4/2018: NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

SUMMONS

12/27/2017: SUMMONS

57 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Save Our Neighborhood (Plaintiff); Debra Sepulveda (Plaintiff); Adolfo Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Memorandum of Costs; Filed by Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE - OTHER (SPECIFY): REAL ESTATE, NUISANCE, ETC.

    Read MoreRead Less
139 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • Declaration; Filed by South El Monte (Defendant); Vasquez, Jennifer, City Manager of the (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Save Our Neighborhood (Plaintiff); Debra Sepulveda (Plaintiff); Adolfo Carrillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE & ATTACHED ORDERS THEREON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Petition; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • VERIFRED PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS (1) TO COMPEL THE CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE TO ENFORCE ITS MUNICIPAL CODE (2) TO STAY THE ISSUANCE OF BUILDING PERMITS (3) TO DECLARE ISSUED BUILDING PERMITS VOID

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAWRENCE EQUIPMENT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SOUTH EL MONTE A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDBERG ALAN N.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIOVINCO GINETTA LORRAINE