Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 16:34:14 (UTC).

SAVALA, DANYELLE VERONICA VS BULLARD, JASON CD LATCHISON

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 SAVALA, DANYELLE VERONICA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against BULLARD, JASON CD LATCHISON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0041

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAVALA DANYELLE VERONICA

Respondent

BULLARD JASON CD LATCHISON

 

Court Documents

Request - Enter Default FL165

2/25/2021: Request - Enter Default FL165

Judgment - Package Received-Supplemental - REJECTED - 03/08/21

2/25/2021: Judgment - Package Received-Supplemental - REJECTED - 03/08/21

Certificate of Clerk

3/8/2021: Certificate of Clerk

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

3/16/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure

Declaration - Default FL170

3/16/2021: Declaration - Default FL170

Declaration - Separate Property

1/14/2021: Declaration - Separate Property

Declaration - Income and Expense

1/14/2021: Declaration - Income and Expense

Summons

1/14/2021: Summons

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/14/2021: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

1/14/2021: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

1/14/2021: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

1/14/2021: Petition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child

Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Faulty - form not completed.

1/15/2021: Declaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure - Faulty - form not completed.

Proof of Service of Summons - Served: 1/14/21

1/15/2021: Proof of Service of Summons - Served: 1/14/21

Notice - Case Assignment

1/14/2021: Notice - Case Assignment

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/14/2021: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketJudgment Package Received - FC2336 (Sent to SW11 for signature on 03/25/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Default FL170; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketJudgment - Package Received-Supplemental (REJECTED - 03/08/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketRequest - Enter Default FL165; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Service of Preliminary Dec. of Disclosure (Faulty - form not completed. ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons (Served: 1/14/21 ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/o Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice - Case Assignment

    Read MoreRead Less