This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 10:52:41 (UTC).

SAUL TYLER VS TUTOR PERINI CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2022 SAUL TYLER filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TUTOR PERINI CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5498

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYLER SAUL

Defendants

AGUILAR EDGAR

O & G INDUSTRIES INC.

TUTOR PERINI CORP.

TUTOR PERINI/O&G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STERLING IAN G.

Defendant Attorney

SCHUBERT WILLIAM RUSSELL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/26/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

5/9/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; CASE MANAGEMENT CONF...)

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

5/9/2023: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Reply - REPLY REPLY OF DEFENDANTS TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION, O&G INDUSTRIES, INC, AND TUTOR PERINI / O&G TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

5/2/2023: Reply - REPLY REPLY OF DEFENDANTS TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION, O&G INDUSTRIES, INC, AND TUTOR PERINI / O&G TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

4/26/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION

4/26/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION

Case Management Statement

4/25/2023: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/24/2023: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/7/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

2/21/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/17/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

2/17/2023: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

2/1/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

1/26/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Request for Judicial Notice

1/6/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SYLVIA CORSINI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TUTOR PERINI CORP., O&G INDUSTRIES INC. AND TUTOR PERINI-O&G TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION

1/6/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SYLVIA CORSINI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TUTOR PERINI CORP., O&G INDUSTRIES INC. AND TUTOR PERINI-O&G TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION

Motion to Compel Arbitration

1/6/2023: Motion to Compel Arbitration

Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM R. SCHUBERT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TUTOR PERINI CORP., O&G INDUSTRIES INC. AND TUTOR PERINI-O&G TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION

1/6/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF WILLIAM R. SCHUBERT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TUTOR PERINI CORP., O&G INDUSTRIES INC. AND TUTOR PERINI-O&G TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND STAY LITIGATION

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2023
  • Hearing06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2023
  • Hearing06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 36 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Saul Tyler (Plaintiff); As to: Edgar Aguilar (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 05/05/2023; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Signed and Filed by: Saul Tyler (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration; Case Management Conf...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 05/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 06/22/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 06/22/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/09/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2023
  • DocketReply REPLY OF DEFENDANTS TUTOR PERINI CORPORATION, O&G INDUSTRIES, INC, AND TUTOR PERINI / O&G TO PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; Filed by: Tutor Perini Corp. (Defendant); O & G Industries, Inc. (Defendant); Tutor Perini/O&G (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketAddress for Ian G. Sterling (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 36

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Saul Tyler (Plaintiff); As to: Tutor Perini Corp., a California corporation (Defendant); O & G Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Tutor Perini/O&G, a California joint venture (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Saul Tyler (Plaintiff); As to: Tutor Perini Corp., a California corporation (Defendant); O & G Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Tutor Perini/O&G, a California joint venture (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Saul Tyler (Plaintiff); As to: Tutor Perini Corp., a California corporation (Defendant); O & G Industries, Inc., a California corporation (Defendant); Tutor Perini/O&G, a California joint venture (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less