Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 20:03:44 (UTC).

SASSY PRODUCTION LOCATIONS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS SASSY PRODUCTIONS LOCATIONS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 SASSY PRODUCTION LOCATIONS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SASSY PRODUCTIONS LOCATIONS, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0338

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SASSY PRODUCTION LOCATIONS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

ROJAS JAMES

STEARN DAVID

SASSY PRODUCTIONS LOCATIONS LLC A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AQUINO JESSICA

GRK PROPERTY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHEZRONY GUY

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Ruling

6/2/2021: Notice of Ruling

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/24/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

5/26/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice of Ruling

3/3/2021: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

2/3/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

9/10/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/10/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/5/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/5/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/5/2020: Complaint

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2021
  • Hearing08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • Hearing08/24/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sassy Production Locations, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sassy Production Locations, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sassy Production Locations, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Sassy Production Locations, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service (as to all Defendants) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sassy Production Locations, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Sassy Production Locations, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court Congestion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sassy Production Locations, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sassy Production Locations, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sassy Production Locations, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRK PROPERTY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHEZRONY GUY