This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2021 at 21:26:17 (UTC).

SARKIS SARKISYAN VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/29/2020 SARKIS SARKISYAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9512

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SARKISYAN SARKIS

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CITY OF MALIBU

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

Cross Defendants

C.A. RASMUSSEN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ROES 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

QUIMBY RACHEL C.

Defendant Attorney

HEATHCOTE TAMARA M.

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

YOO RACHEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/29/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/29/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/20/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

2/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

2/2/2021: PI General Order

Request for Dismissal

1/25/2021: Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney

6/2/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service

4/21/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Cross-Complaint

4/13/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

4/13/2021: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/13/2021: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Request for Dismissal

6/30/2021: Request for Dismissal

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/26/2023
  • Hearing12/26/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • Hearing06/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • Hearing06/14/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by California Department of Transportation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by The People of the State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation Erroneously Sued As California Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by California Department of Transportation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by The People of the State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation Erroneously Sued As California Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by The People of the State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation Erroneously Sued As California Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by The People of the State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation Erroneously Sued As California Department of Transportation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sarkis Sarkisyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Sarkis Sarkisyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sarkis Sarkisyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sarkis Sarkisyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sarkis Sarkisyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CA Rasmussen, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF MALIBU is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YOO JI YEON