This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2020 at 08:07:15 (UTC).

SARIN PANJARIAN ET AL VS LINDA HELEN BUTLER RUZICH

Case Summary

On 07/25/2017 SARIN PANJARIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against LINDA HELEN BUTLER RUZICH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are YOLANDA OROZCO, LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0005

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

YOLANDA OROZCO

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Guardian Ad Litems and Not Classified By Court

PANJARIAN SARIN

APELIAN ARI

APELIAN AREN

Plaintiff and Petitioner

APELIAN ARI

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

RUZICH LINDA HELEN BUTLER

Minor and Not Classified By Court

APELIAN AREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Minor Attorneys

ABKARIAN SONA ESQ.

ABKARIAN SONA

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

MCCLAUGHERTY JAY S. ESQ.

MCCLAUGHERTY JAY S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by SARIN PANJARIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • Docketat 09:20 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order RE: COVID-19)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order RE: COVID-19) of 04/29/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Proof of Deposit into Blocked Account) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketReceipt and Acknowledgment of Order for the Deposit of Money Into Blocked Account; Filed by SARIN PANJARIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
91 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by SARIN PANJARIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • DocketOrd Apptng Guardian Ad Litem; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ARI APELIAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC670005    Hearing Date: October 28, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: PETITION TO APPROVE MINOR’S COMPROMISE

Claimant Aren Apelian (“Claimant”), a minor, by and through his Guardian Ad Litem, Sarin Panjarian (“Petitioner”), has agreed to settle his claims against Defendant Linda Helen Butler Ruzich in exchange for $10,000.00. If approved, $2,739.38 will be used for medical expenses, $2,500.00 will be used for attorney’s fees, and $280.82 will be used for non-medical expenses, leaving a balance of $4,479.80 for Claimant, which will be deposited into a blocked account, subject to withdrawal only upon authorization of the court.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (Probate Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc. § 372.) The Court has reviewed the proposed settlement and finds that it is fair and reasonable. Further, the requested attorney’s fees, which amounts to approximately 25% of the total settlement, is fair and reasonable.

The unopposed Petition to approve minor’s compromise is GRANTED.

The Court sets an OSC for November 25, 2019 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 4B for proof of deposit in the blocked account. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 7.953(a).) If an acknowledgement of receipt by the financial institution is filed before that date, no appearance will be required.

Per California Rules of Court, Rule 7.952, Petitioner and Claimant must appear at the October 28, 2019 hearing, unless the Court finds good cause to excuse their appearance. The Court finds that Claimant’s appearance is not necessary, but will require Petitioner to appear.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.