This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/05/2021 at 02:00:35 (UTC).

SARGIS KHACHATRYAN VS TURO INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/02/2021 SARGIS KHACHATRYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TURO INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4072

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KHACHATRYAN SARGIS

Defendants

SOLOVJOVA VIKA

TURO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

2/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

2/25/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/2/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/2/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/2/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2024
  • Hearing01/30/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • Hearing08/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Hearing07/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sargis Khachatryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sargis Khachatryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sargis Khachatryan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TURO INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIRAPETIAN STEPHAN