Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/22/2021 at 09:04:03 (UTC).

SARENA SNIDER VS TELLUS BUILD, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 SARENA SNIDER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TELLUS BUILD, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS and MARK H. EPSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0913

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

MARK H. EPSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

SNIDER SARENA

KONRAD ROOF CO.

ROES 1-100

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

TELLUS MANAGEMENT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FOWLER JESSE RICHARD

TELLUS DESIGN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

RIORDAN BRETT HOWARD

MCGRANE MATT

TELLUS GLOBAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TELLUS BUILD INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KONRAD ROOF CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CARRALEJO ADAM THOMAS

MADARIAGA DAVID BERRY

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

KOSKA WILLIAM KENNETH

JEFFERY MONA

GRANT TIMOTHY JOSEPH

INAMINE BRIAN SEISHIN

MADARIAGA DAVID BERRY

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

11/20/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

12/1/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Change of Firm Name

8/26/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name

Case Management Statement

7/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/4/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal

1/8/2020: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

1/21/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/15/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Ruling

12/17/2019: Notice of Ruling

Notice - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

11/21/2019: Notice - NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING AND ORDER

Case Management Statement

10/29/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS, TELLUS MANAGEMENT, INC., TELLUS BUILD, INC., TELLUS DESIGN, INC., MATT MCGRANE AND BRETT HOWARD RIORDAN

10/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANTS, TELLUS MANAGEMENT, INC., TELLUS BUILD, INC., TELLUS DESIGN, INC., MATT MCGRANE AND BRETT HOWARD RIORDAN

Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF STATUTORY ADVANCE JURY FEES BY DEFENDANTS TELLUS MANAGMENT, INC & BRETT HOWARD RIORDAN

10/30/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF STATUTORY ADVANCE JURY FEES BY DEFENDANTS TELLUS MANAGMENT, INC & BRETT HOWARD RIORDAN

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/26/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Proof of Service by Mail

5/23/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Complaint

5/16/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/16/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

62 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • Hearing01/31/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Hearing01/24/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department R at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by Tellus Global, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Konrad Roof Co. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Tellus Global, Inc., a California Corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department R, Mark H. Epstein, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Tellus Management, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Jesse Richard Fowler (Defendant); Brett Howard Riordan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Konrad Roof Co. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Sarena Snider (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Tellus Global, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tellus Global, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketAnswer (by Defendants, Tellus Build, Inc. et al. to Complaint by Sarena Snider; and Demand Jury Trial); Filed by Tellus Build, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Tellus Design, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant); Tellus Global, Inc., a California Corporation (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Sarena Snider (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sarena Snider (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sarena Snider (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sarena Snider (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TELLUS GLOBAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Koska, William K