This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 09:28:46 (UTC).

SARAH WATERS VS DEBRA O'NEIL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2021 SARAH WATERS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DEBRA O'NEIL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2352

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WATERS SARAH

Defendants

O'NEIL DEBRA

O'NEIL MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARCUS GERALD LEE

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2024
  • Hearing11/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • Hearing05/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2023
  • Hearing05/03/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sarah Waters (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sarah Waters (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sarah Waters (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARCUS GERALD LEE