This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/18/2021 at 06:23:40 (UTC).

SARAH SIBIA VS DENNIS ALLEN ASSOCIATES ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2018 SARAH SIBIA filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against DENNIS ALLEN ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN and MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3479

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

SIBIA SARAH

Respondents, Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

TROY COMPANY

DENNIS ALLEN ASSOCIATES

ALLEN CONSTRUCTION

DOES 1-100

GATES DOORS & IRONWORKS INC.

INDUSTRIAL SKYLIGHTS INC.

NEW IMAGE PLASTERING INC.

A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING WLA INC.

SILVER STRAND INC.

SPLENDID STONE AND TILE INC.

LAZCANO'S MASONRY & CONCRETE INC.

Petitioners, Cross Defendants, Plaintiffs and Defendants

SIBIA SARAH

TROY COMPANY

DENNIS ALLEN ASSOCIATES

GATES DOORS & IRONWORKS INC.

OPTIMAL CONSTRUCTION CORP.

INDUSTRIAL SKYLIGHTS INC.

SANROMAN CUSTOM CONTRACTING INC.

CISNEROS TERRAZZO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

NEW IMAGE PLASTERING INC.

ZAMKOCHYAN STEPHAN DBA NEW PIPE PLUMBLING & ROOTER

A-1 ALL AMERICAN ROOFING WLA INC.

CITY WALL BUILDERS INC.

SILVER STRAND INC.

BRIANT RONALD LOUIS DBA RON BRIANT HEATING AND AIR CONDITIONING

THOEMMES CABINET MAKERS INC.

JOHN RETICH ELECTRIC INC.

SPLENDID STONE AND TILE INC.

LAZCANO'S MASONRY & CONCRETE INC.

Not Classified By Court, Defendant and Respondent

ALLEN CONSTRUCTION

34 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

MURTAUGH TREGLIA STERN & DEILY LLP

ARMSTRONG MARK LEIGH

2603 Main Street Penthouse

Irvine, CA 92614-6232

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

GROSFELD ROBERT

MCELROY CONOR HOWELL ESQ.

ORLAND JAMES

GREEN SCOTT THOMAS ESQ.

O'BRIEN JILLISA L. ESQ.

MCELROY CONOR

CAMPBELL PATRICK J

BUYNAK FAUVER ARCHBALD & SPRAY LLC

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

GREEN SCOTT THOMAS ESQ.

O'BRIEN JILLISA L. ESQ.

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

GUTIERREZ GIGI R.

MCELROY CONOR HOWELL ESQ.

MCELROY CONOR

CAMPBELL PATRICK J

SIMS BOBBY DALE

Cross Defendant, Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

ARMSTRONG MARK LEIGH

2603 Main Street Penthouse

Irvine, CA 92614-6232

BARGER GLENN T.

O'MEARA JOHN

GROSFELD ROBERT

SALOMONS GARY

GUTIERREZ GIGI R.

WYMAN SAMUEL A.

ZIMET MARC JOSEPH

MCELROY CONOR HOWELL ESQ.

ORLAND JAMES

HARRIS CHARLES L

GRANATA VALERIA

DALMORE JEAN A

7 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

12/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

1/15/2021: Notice of Settlement

Request for Dismissal

1/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

1/19/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Request for Dismissal

2/18/2021: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

8/3/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

8/3/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Request for Dismissal

6/30/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/17/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/17/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/17/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/17/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/17/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal

7/17/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/22/2020

7/22/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/22/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT MINUTE ORDER

7/27/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT MINUTE ORDER

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

7/13/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

199 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (as to Complaint;) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (with prejudice as to the entire action of all parties and all causes of action); Filed by Sarah Sibia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (without prejudice as to the Cross-Complaint filed by Lazcano's Masonry & Concrete, Inc. on 7/17/19); Filed by Lazcano's Masonry & Concrete, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Sarah Sibia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Meyer Coatings, Inc. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
224 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-08-09 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Sarah Sibia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sarah Sibia (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TROY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where DENNIS ALLEN ASSOCIATES is a litigant