This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2020 at 07:00:56 (UTC).

SARAH KERLEY, CO-ADMINISTRATOR OF ESTATE OF PHILIPPA LUCILLE JOHNSTON VS DON O WEBER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2020 SARAH KERLEY, CO-ADMINISTRATOR OF ESTATE OF PHILIPPA LUCILLE JOHNSTON filed an Other lawsuit against DON O WEBER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0407

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SARAH KERLEY CO-ADMINISTRATOR OF ESTATE OF PHILIPPA LUCILLE JOHNSTON

Defendants

WEBER DON O

WEBER MARCIE A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PIERSON ELIZABETH THOMPSON

BIRKEL JULIA

HIX CLAYTON J

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/4/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (MARCIE A WEBER)

6/11/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (MARCIE A WEBER)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

6/11/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (DON O WEBER)

6/11/2020: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER (EVICTION) (DON O WEBER)

Request for Dismissal

6/18/2020: Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/15/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

6/15/2020: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/15/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: (Failure To Process Unlawful Detainer) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sarah Kerley, Co-Administrator of Estate of Philippa Lucille Johnston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((ALL OCCUPANTS)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Don O Weber)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) ((Marcie A Weber)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sarah Kerley, Co-Administrator of Estate of Philippa Lucille Johnston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sarah Kerley, Co-Administrator of Estate of Philippa Lucille Johnston (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PIERSON ELIZABETH THOMPSON

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HIX CLAYTON J

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BIRKEL JULIA LYNN