This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/19/2022 at 03:53:11 (UTC).

SARAH KELLY, ET AL. VS GENERAL PARTNERS ASSET HOLDINGS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/18/2021 SARAH KELLY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against GENERAL PARTNERS ASSET HOLDINGS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0649

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ESTATE OF WILLIAM STANO

KELLY SARAH

Defendants

GENERAL PARTNERS ASSET HOLDINGS INC.

MEADOWS MINDY

SOUTH BAY BARBA OWNER LLC

MINDY MEADOWS LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ESLAMBOLY-HAKIM SHARONA

Defendant Attorney

CANADA RICHARD BRENT

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/18/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

2/4/2022: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

2/4/2022: Demand for Jury Trial

PI General Order

9/13/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

3/25/2022: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal

3/24/2022: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/14/2024
  • Hearing08/14/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • Hearing02/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • Hearing02/01/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by Sarah Kelly (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Sarah Kelly (Plaintiff); Estate of William Stano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by General Partners Asset Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by General Partners Asset Holdings, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sarah Kelly (Plaintiff); Estate of William Stano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sarah Kelly (Plaintiff); Estate of William Stano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sarah Kelly (Plaintiff); Estate of William Stano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CANADA RICHARD BRENT