This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 00:32:39 (UTC).

SARAH KALIN VS PV HOLDING CORP ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/24/2018 a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle case was filed by SARAH KALIN against PV HOLDING CORP in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3221

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KALIN SARAH

Respondents and Defendants

KONG EDWARD

AVIS BUDGET GROUP

PV HOLDING CORP.

DOES 1-15

 

Court Documents

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHLF OF DEFENDANT AVIS RENT A CARE SYSTEM, LLC

6/22/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHLF OF DEFENDANT AVIS RENT A CARE SYSTEM, LLC

Proof of Service

6/25/2018: Proof of Service

Separate Statement

12/5/2018: Separate Statement

Request for Judicial Notice

12/5/2018: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration

12/5/2018: Declaration

Declaration

12/5/2018: Declaration

Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication

12/5/2018: Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication

Request for Refund / Order

12/21/2018: Request for Refund / Order

Association of Attorney

12/24/2018: Association of Attorney

Application

1/15/2019: Application

Minute Order

4/4/2019: Minute Order

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing

7/1/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing

Notice

7/9/2019: Notice

Ex Parte Application

7/10/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

7/10/2019: Minute Order

Motion for Order

7/11/2019: Motion for Order

SUMMONS

4/24/2018: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/24/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • Motion for Order (Motion for an Order for Service of Summons by Publication); Filed by Sarah Kalin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order for Service by Publication) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order for Service by P...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Ex Parte Application (for an Order for Service by Publication); Filed by Sarah Kalin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Notice (of Continuance of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEM LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing (for Publication re: Edward)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Sarah Kalin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an Order for Service of Summons by Publication) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an Order for Service of S...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Application (for Publication re: Edward); Filed by Sarah Kalin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2018
  • Declaration (Declaration of Michael A. Kruppe in Support of Defendant Avis Rent A Car Systems, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEM LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Request for Judicial Notice (in Support of Defendant Avis Rent A Car System, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment); Filed by AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEM LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • Joinder to Motion for Summary Judgment / Adjudication; Filed by AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEM LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Sarah Kalin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • Answer; Filed by AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEM LLC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT ON BEHLF OF DEFENDANT AVIS RENT A CARE SYSTEM, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by Sarah Kalin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC703221    Hearing Date: March 18, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SARAH KALIN,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

PV HOLDING CORP,, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC703221

[TENTATIVE] ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

March 18, 2020

Defendant, Avis Rent a Car System, LLC filed this motion for summary judgment on 5/24/19, setting it for hearing on 12/05/18, setting it for hearing on 7/30/19. On 7/09/19, Defendant filed a notice of continuance, pursuant to which the motion was rescheduled for 9/09/19. The hearing has subsequently been continued multiple times. Plaintiff timely filed opposition papers on 12/27/19, at which time the hearing was scheduled for 1/17/20.

Defendant has currently scheduled the hearing on the motion for 3/18/20. Any reply to the opposition was due on or before 3/13/20. The Court has not yet received any reply papers, either through e-filing, scanned documents, or its courtesy copy box. The Court’s research attorney attempted to contact Defense Counsel to inquire about reply papers, but the phone number was not working, and no e-mail address was provided on the State Bar website or the caption of the moving papers.

The Court wishes to review all papers filed in connection with the motion for summary judgment, and therefore continues the hearing date from 3/18/20 to 4/01/20 at 1:30 p.m. in Department 3 of the Spring Street Courthouse. The time for filing a reply is not extended as result of this ruling.

If 4/01/20 is not an available date for the parties, they are ordered to meet and confer and use the online reservation management system to reschedule the hearing on the motion to the next mutually available calendar date. The Court notes that trial is not scheduled until 8/25/20.

If the parties have resolved their issues and the summary judgment no longer remains pending, Defense Counsel must promptly use the online reservation system to take the hearing on the motion off calendar.

Moving Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

Dated this 18th day of March, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court

Case Number: BC703221    Hearing Date: March 10, 2020    Dept: 31

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

SARAH KALIN,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

PV HOLIDNG CORP., ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: BC703221

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Dept. 31

1:30 p.m.

March 10, 2020

Plaintiff, Sarah Kalin filed this action against Defendants, PV Holding Corp., Avis Budget Group, and Edward Kong for damages arising out of an automobile accident. Plaintiff filed the complaint on 4/24/18, and the case was originally set for trial on 10/24/19. On 7/31/19, the Court signed a stipulation and order continuing the trial date from 10/24/19 to 4/23/20.

At this time, PV and Avis move to continue the trial date from 4/23/20 for four months. They move based on the contention that they believe Kong is deceased, and they are attempting to confirm this fact. Defendants note that they have a hearing on a summary judgment motion scheduled for 3/18/20, but evidence concerning Defendants’ knowledge of Kong’s ability to drive is relevant to the reply they need to file in connection with that motion. If this motion to continue trial is granted, they intend to continue the hearing on their summary judgment motion so they can obtain such evidence.

The motion to continue the trial date is unopposed and granted. The 4/23/20 trial date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Tuesday, 8/25/20 at 8:30 a.m. in Department 31 of the Spring Street Courthouse. The 4/09/20 FSC date is advanced to today’s date and continued to Tuesday, 8/11/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 31. All discovery and expert cut-off dates are continued to reflect the new trial date.

Moving Defendants are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept31@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.

Dated this 10th day of March, 2020

Hon. Thomas D. Long

Judge of the Superior Court