This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2019 at 04:46:32 (UTC).

EARAH EMICK VS ANNIE RAPAPORT ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 EARAH EMICK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANNIE RAPAPORT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3382

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

EMICK SARAH

Defendants, Respondents and Cross Plaintiffs

RAPAPORT ROBIN

RAPAPORT ANNIE

GURNEY JOSHUA

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

KRAMER DANIEL K. ESQ.

KRAMER HOLCOMB SHEIK LLP

JOHNSON TERESA ANN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MULVIHILL CYNTHIA COULTER ESQ.

RAFFALOW RHOADS & BRETOI

LAW OFFICE OF IRENE A. FRAZIER

SIEGEL EZRA D

Other Attorneys

DEVLIN STEPHEN THOMAS

MACDONALD SCOTT L.

VELASTEGUI MARVIN

 

Court Documents

INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

2/20/2018: INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE FORM FOR PERSONAL INJURY COURTS

Ex Parte Application

10/26/2018: Ex Parte Application

Opposition

10/26/2018: Opposition

Minute Order

10/26/2018: Minute Order

Opposition

11/13/2018: Opposition

Notice of Ruling

11/15/2018: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order

1/11/2019: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AT ISSUE IN PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANNIE RAPAPORT'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUES

12/11/2017: PLAINTIFF'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AT ISSUE IN PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANNIE RAPAPORT'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND REQUES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANNIE RAPAPORT'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION - SET ONE; ETC

12/11/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT ANNIE RAPAPORT'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION - SET ONE; ETC

PROOF OF HAND DELIVERY

12/12/2017: PROOF OF HAND DELIVERY

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

5/31/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

SUMMONS

5/31/2017: SUMMONS

CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNITY, CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

8/3/2017: CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR EQUITABLE INDEMNITY, CONTRIBUTION AND DECLARATORY RELIEF

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

8/3/2017: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/3/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/30/2017: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

8/30/2017: ANSWER TO UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

8/30/2017: SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

39 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by Joshua Gurney (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by Joshua Gurney (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Notice (NOTICE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY CHANGE); Filed by Robin Rapaport (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Deposition Notice and Subpoena for Appearance and Production of Documents Issued to Charlene C. Nguyen, O.D.) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • Notice of Ruling; Filed by Annie Rapaport (Legacy Party); Robin Rapaport (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • at 1:30 PM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Hearing on Motion - Other (Reopen Discovery to Allow Deposition of Charlene Nguyen, D.O.) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Minute Order ((Defendant's Motion to Reopen Discovery to Allow Deposition of...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Opposition (Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants Annie and Robin Rapaports' Motion to Reopen Discovery); Filed by Sarah Emick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Reopen Discovery to Allow Deposition of Charlene Nguyen, D.O. to Take Place; Request For Sanctions in the Amount of $2100; Filed by Annie Rapaport (Legacy Party); Robin Rapaport (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2017
  • Cross-Complaint; Filed by Joshua Gurney (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sarah Emick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sarah Emick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by Sarah Emick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Sarah Emick (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES 1. NEGLIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC663382    Hearing Date: February 13, 2020    Dept: 29

Emick v. Rapaport, et al.

Defendant Joshua Gurney’s Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answer is GRANTED.

Defendant seeks leave to amend his answer to add an affirmative defense based on the sudden emergency doctrine. Plaintiff does not oppose the motion. Leave to amend is liberally granted unless there is a showing of prejudice. (See, e.g., Hulsey v. Koehler (1990) 218 Cal.App.3d 1150, 1159.) There is no showing of prejudice here. Thus, leave to amend is granted.

Defendant is ordered to file an amended answer within 10 days of the date of this order.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.