This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2023 at 07:44:03 (UTC).

SARAH ELIZABETH CASTRO GARCIA VS DANIEL BARAJAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/24/2022 SARAH ELIZABETH CASTRO GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DANIEL BARAJAS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1010

  • Filing Date:

    10/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTRO GARCIA SARAH ELIZABETH

Defendants

BARAJAS DANIEL

DOES 1 TO 30

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMPION KIARASH SHAMLOO

Defendant Attorney

OLSON SONALI

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/24/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/24/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/24/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

10/24/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

10/28/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/28/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

11/23/2022: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2023
  • Hearing05/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/11/2023
  • Hearing05/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: DANIEL BARAJAS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 05/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: SARAH ELIZABETH CASTRO GARCIA (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL BARAJAS (Defendant); DOES 1 to 30 (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SARAH ELIZABETH CASTRO GARCIA (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL BARAJAS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SARAH ELIZABETH CASTRO GARCIA (Plaintiff); As to: DANIEL BARAJAS (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less