This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 04:32:16 (UTC).

SARAH DAVIS VS GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2019 SARAH DAVIS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMAS D. LONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2162

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

THOMAS D. LONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DAVIS SARAH

Defendants

STANDI JOHN HENRY

GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELDABE S EDMOND

Defendant Attorney

KING DAVID PAUL

 

Court Documents

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/2/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION - DISCOVERY RESOLUTION

7/8/2020: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER STIPULATION - DISCOVERY RESOLUTION

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

10/21/2020: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

10/21/2020: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

10/21/2020: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

10/21/2020: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

10/21/2020: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

10/21/2020: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

10/21/2020: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Separate Statement

10/21/2020: Separate Statement

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

2/23/2021: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/30/2021: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer

1/8/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/9/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/22/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/22/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/22/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • Hearing11/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • Hearing03/11/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Hearing02/25/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Golden State Water Company (Defendant); John Henry Standi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 31; Non-Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 31; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Golden State Water Company (Defendant); John Henry Standi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 31; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (STIPULATION - DISCOVERY RESOLUTION); Filed by Golden State Water Company (Defendant); John Henry Standi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Sarah Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sarah Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Golden State Water Company (Defendant); John Henry Standi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates {\par}); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Sarah Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sarah Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sarah Davis (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOLDEN STATE WATER COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KING DAVID P