This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/24/2023 at 08:55:06 (UTC).

SARAH BAHAR VS CAMPING WORLD HOLDINGS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 SARAH BAHAR filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CAMPING WORLD HOLDINGS, INC ,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BARBARA M. SCHEPER and STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6977

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

STEPHEN I. GOORVITCH

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAHAR SARAH

Defendants

BARR DYLAN

CAMPING WORLD HOLDINGS INC.

CWI INC. DBA CAMPING WORLD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAZARUS PETER ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

BLACKBURN BARBARA ALLYN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/9/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING ARBITRATION OR SE...)

9/20/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOLLOWING ARBITRATION OR SE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 08/08/2022

8/8/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 08/08/2022

Notice of Settlement

8/8/2022: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

8/8/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

5/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE (PROPOSED) STIPULATION AND ORDER;)

10/20/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE (PROPOSED) STIPULATION AND ORDER;)

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) DEFENDANTS' CAMPING WORLD HOLDING, INC. AND CWI, INC. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PEREMPTOR

10/28/2021: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6) - CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER - PEREMPTORY (170.6) DEFENDANTS' CAMPING WORLD HOLDING, INC. AND CWI, INC. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PEREMPTOR

Declaration - DECLARATION OF VICTORIA A. KOVANIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' CAMPING WORLD HOLDING, INC. AND CWI, INC. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION [CCP 170.6]

10/28/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF VICTORIA A. KOVANIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' CAMPING WORLD HOLDING, INC. AND CWI, INC. NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION [CCP 170.6]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION (CCP 170.6))

11/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE PEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION (CCP 170.6))

Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

11/1/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment/Vacate Hearings

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/3/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

11/5/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Case Management Statement

11/5/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT ACTION TO BINDIN...)

11/9/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT ACTION TO BINDIN...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT ACTION TO BINDIN...) OF 11/09/2021

11/9/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT ACTION TO BINDIN...) OF 11/09/2021

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO SUBMITE ACTION TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY THE ACTION

11/9/2021: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO SUBMITE ACTION TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY THE ACTION

Proof of Personal Service

9/22/2021: Proof of Personal Service

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/10/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal following Arbitration or Settlement scheduled for 11/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/10/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2022

DocketThe case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Binding Arbitration

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2022

DocketOn the Complaint filed by SARAH BAHAR on 07/22/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by SARAH BAHAR as to the entire action

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2022

DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: SARAH BAHAR (Plaintiff); As to: CAMPING WORLD HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant); CWI, INC. (Defendant); DYLAN BARR (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal following Arbitration or Settlement scheduled for 11/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal following Arbitration or Se...)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2022

DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal following Arbitration or Settlement scheduled for 09/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/16/2022 08:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022

DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: SARAH BAHAR (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No; Settlement Type: Unconditional; Set Hearing and Generate Notice?: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal following Arbitration or Settlement scheduled for 09/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 39

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2022

DocketMinute Order (Court Order: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
30 More Docket Entries
07/30/2021

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 12/20/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 30

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2021

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2021

DocketUpdated -- Peter Lazarus, Esq. (Attorney): First Name changed from MICHAEL to Peter; Last Name changed from HOLLOMAN to Lazarus; Name Suffix: Esq. Middle Name: blank

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2021

DocketAddress for Peter Lazarus, Esq. (Attorney) updated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2021

DocketUpdated -- DYLAN BARR (Defendant): Last Name changed from BARR an individual to BARR

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2021

DocketComplaint; Filed by: SARAH BAHAR (Plaintiff); As to: CAMPING WORLD HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant); CWI, INC. (Defendant); DYLAN BARR an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2021

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: SARAH BAHAR (Plaintiff); As to: CAMPING WORLD HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant); CWI, INC. (Defendant); DYLAN BARR an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2021

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: SARAH BAHAR (Plaintiff); As to: CAMPING WORLD HOLDINGS, INC. (Defendant); CWI, INC. (Defendant); DYLAN BARR an individual (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2021

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/22/2021

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Barbara M. Scheper in Department 30 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less