This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2023 at 08:33:11 (UTC).

SARA ZAZUETA VS HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.

Case Summary

On 02/21/2023 SARA ZAZUETA filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against HOME DEPOT U S A , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is FRANK M. TAVELMAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0400

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

FRANK M. TAVELMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAZUETA SARA

Defendant

HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARMAKSZIAN ROSIE

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/21/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/21/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

2/21/2023: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/21/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/21/2023: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

5/4/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 05/04/2023

5/4/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE) OF 05/04/2023

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROSIE BARMAKSZIAN IN RESPONSE TO COURTS OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

5/17/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ROSIE BARMAKSZIAN IN RESPONSE TO COURTS OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Personal Service

5/18/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2023
  • Hearing07/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • Hearing07/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2023
  • Hearing07/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department A at 300 East Olive, Burbank, CA 91502; Order to Show Cause Re: re: sanctions in the amount of $250.00 for Plaintiff's counsel failure to appear for 05/04/2023 hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Sara Zazueta (Plaintiff); As to: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 05/18/2023; Service Cost: 89.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF ROSIE BARMAKSZIAN IN RESPONSE TO COURTS OSC FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed by: Sara Zazueta (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: re: sanctions in the amount of $250.00 for Plaintiff's counsel failure to appear for 05/04/2023 hearing scheduled for 07/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/12/2023 at 09:00 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service) of 05/04/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/12/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketAddress for Rosie Barmakszian (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Sara Zazueta (Plaintiff); As to: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Sara Zazueta (Plaintiff); As to: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sara Zazueta (Plaintiff); As to: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/12/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Frank M. Tavelman in Department A Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less