This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2020 at 07:08:38 (UTC).

SARA TENA ET AL VS JAMISON MANAGEMENT COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/28/2018 SARA TENA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JAMISON MANAGEMENT COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, MARK A. BORENSTEIN, RAMONA G. SEE and DEIRDRE HILL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5640

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

RAMONA G. SEE

DEIRDRE HILL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem

TENA SARA

Defendants and Respondents

CROSSPOINT IMPERIAL VENTURES LLC

DOES1-50

JAMISON MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC.

Minor

ELRYON TENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

MCREYNOLDS C.R. ESQ.

ELMASSIAN ALBERT

Defendant Attorneys

BORDIN-WOSK JOSHUA D ESQ.

BORDIN-WOSK JOSHUA D

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY DEFEN...) OF 07/06/2020

7/6/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY DEFEN...) OF 07/06/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY DEFEN...)

7/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: WHY DEFEN...)

Answer

7/2/2020: Answer

Amended Complaint

6/15/2020: Amended Complaint

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/01/2020

4/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW) OF 04/01/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT OR ENTRY OF DEF...)

1/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT OR ENTRY OF DEF...)

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE

1/13/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 01/23/2020

1/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...) OF 01/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

1/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER AND REASSIGNMENT OF COMPLICATED PERS...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMU...)

1/27/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE (NOT ANTI-SLAPP) - WITHOUT DEMU...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

2/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/05/2020

2/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 02/05/2020

Substitution of Attorney

2/14/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/15/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Personal Service

10/21/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; TRI...)

10/21/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; TRI...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

8/14/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

3/13/2018: APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM?CIVIL

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • Hearing09/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • Hearing09/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Order to Show Cause Re: (why defendant Crosspoint should not be dismissed for failure to serve and failure to prosecute) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why defen...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: why defen...) of 07/06/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Jamison Management Company, Inc. (Defendant); Crosspoint Imperial Ventures, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by Sara Tena (Plaintiff); Tena Elryon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M, Deirdre Hill, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Tri...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Sara Tena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Sara Tena (Plaintiff); Tena Elryon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND 1) BREACH OF IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY ;ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Sara Tena (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC695640    Hearing Date: January 27, 2020    Dept: 29

AFTER REVIEW OF THE COURT FILE, THE COURT MAKES THE FOLLOWING ORDER:

Department 29 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above-entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in the Southwest District, Torrance, JUDGE RAMONA G. SEE presiding in Department M for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.